MA H790 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3946

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3946
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing mushroom picking for personal use on certain state park lands. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing mushroom picking for personal use on certain state park lands

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3946
2019-04-17JointHearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
2019-04-16JointHearing scheduled for 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S1848 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
H3946 (Replaced by) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback