MA H4151 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the inalienable right to bodily integrity, free from threat or compulsion to accept any unwanted intervention. The Judiciary.
Title
Affirming and protecting the constitutional right to personal liberty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2500 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H2424 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5240
H2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2424 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5240
H2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4151 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4151.pdf |