MA H2512 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5190
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the ownership, use, possession, transfer, purchase, receipt or transportation of weapons, antique weapons, ammunition or ammunition components. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to constitutional rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5190 |
2021-11-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2500 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S1563 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H2486 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S1024 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1581 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S1561 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H5190 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1740 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1563 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H2486 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S1024 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1581 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S1561 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H5190 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1740 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2512 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2512.pdf |