MA H2424 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to limiting the emergency powers of the Governor. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To further protect constitutional rights by limiting the emergency powers of the Governor

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-15JointHearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2469 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2608
H2500 (Similar To) 2021-11-11 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2124 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see S2789
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H3139 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4569
H3189 (Similar To) 2022-01-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S7 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S8 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
S2027 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback