CA SB960 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14526.4 and 14526.6 of, and to add Section 14526.8 to, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 164.6 and 671.5 of, and to add Section 149.20 to, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: planning: complete streets facilities: transit priority projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Sen. Catherine Blakespear [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Sen. Caroline Menjivar [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | April 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14526.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 149.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 164.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 671.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |