MA H4068 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to health insurance coverage for diabetic products. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to diabetic financial protection, assistance, and additional healthcare coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-08-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-08-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2023-06-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S645 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1084 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Accompanied S617
H938 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H4410
H984 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1072 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1084 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Accompanied S617
H938 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H4410
H984 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1072 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4068 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4068.pdf |