MA H984 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S631
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to access to healthcare coverage for serious mental illness. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to access to care for serious mental illness
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
Rep. Christopher Worrell [D] | Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D] | Rep. John Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-04-18 | House | Accompanied by S631 |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S631 (Replaces) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H984
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H984 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H984.pdf |