MA H4039 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize certain investments by the treasurer of the town of Norton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing certain investments by the treasurer of the town of Norton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-12-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-11-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-10-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-08-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-08-03 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2018 (Similar To) 2023-11-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4039 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4039.pdf |