MA H3937 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the automatic registration of eligible voters. Election Laws.
Title
Automatically registering eligible voters and enhancing safeguards against fraud
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-01-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2015-12-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H573 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H574 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
H574 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3937 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3937.pdf |