MA H3893 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to eliminating residency requirements for fortune tellers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Eliminating the residency requirement for fortune tellers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-02-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-01-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3893 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3893.pdf |