MA H3858 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H752

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 502 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the registration of antique snowmobiles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the registration of antique snowmobiles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-08 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 502 of the Acts of 2014
2015-01-06SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2015-01-06HouseEnacted
2015-01-06HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2015-01-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2015-01-06SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2015-01-06SenateOrdered to a third reading
2015-01-06SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2431
2015-01-06SenateRead second
2015-01-06SenateRules suspended
2015-01-06SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2431
2014-12-29SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2014-12-24HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2014-07-22HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2014-07-22HouseRules suspended
2014-07-22HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2014-07-21HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2014-01-21HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2014-01-21HouseNew draft of H752
2014-01-21HouseReported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H752 (Replaces) 2014-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3858

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback