MA H752 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3858

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relativerelative to the registration of antique snowmobiles. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the registration of antique snowmobiles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-21HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3858
2013-06-20JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2013 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in David Prouty High School
2013-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H3858 (Replaced by) 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 502 of the Acts of 2014

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback