MA H3854 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Flanagan of Dennis, a petition of Christopher Richard Flanagan that the Department of Environmental Protection provide certain variances to municipalities with comprehensive wastewater management plans. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative formalizing Title V and Watershed regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4668 |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H4668 (Replaced by) 2024-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
H3850 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2514 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
H3850 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2514 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3854 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3854.pdf |