MA H3834 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to scenic rivers. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting scenic rivers
Sponsors
Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S613 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied H901
S191 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3982 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H4005 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2021
H4047 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4005
H1870 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2314 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H858 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S1072 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H415 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H1188 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
H1861 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H324 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S180 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1074 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied H1513
S775 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1247 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2719
S191 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3982 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H4005 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2021
H4047 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4005
H1870 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2314 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H858 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S1072 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H415 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H1188 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
H1861 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H324 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S180 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1074 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied H1513
S775 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1247 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2719
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3834 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3834.pdf |