MA S1521 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2692
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to liability protection for disaster volunteers. Public Health.
Title
Relative to liability protection for disaster volunteers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2692 |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2293 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H3982 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H4005 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2021
H4047 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4005
S2695 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3982 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H4005 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2021
H4047 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4005
S2695 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1521 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1521.pdf |