MA H3827 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the Housing Commission in the town of Lincoln. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the membership of the Housing Commission in the town of Lincoln
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-05-02 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-11-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-07-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-05-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2054 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H2810 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4262
H4262 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2024
H4664 (Similar To) 2025-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 351 of the Acts of 2024
H2810 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4262
H4262 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2024
H4664 (Similar To) 2025-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 351 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3827 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3827.pdf |