MA H3816 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Accompanied S2732
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to wastewater treatment and disposal in the town of Sandwich. Environment and Natural Resources. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to wastewater treatment and disposal in the town of Sandwich

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-17SenateAccompanied S2732
2024-05-30SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-16HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-18SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-14JointHearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-09-14JointHearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-05-04SenateSenate concurred
2023-05-01HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

H2096 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2024
S2510 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2861
H4509 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2732 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2861 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback