MA H4509 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Xiarhos of Barnstable, a petition of Steven George Xiarhos (by vote of the town) that the charter of the town of Sandwich to be amended to change the town clerk position from an appointed position to an elected position. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Sandwich
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4061 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2024
S2523 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3997 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2024
H4086 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2523 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3997 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2024
H4086 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4509 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4509.pdf |