MA H3815 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3576
Note: Legislation replaced by H3890
Note: Legislation replaced by H3890
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on October 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3890
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3890
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Sudbury to amend Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2012
Title
Authorizing the town of Sudbury to amend Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-07 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3890 |
2015-12-07 | House | Read third |
2015-10-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-21 | House | New draft of H3576 |
2015-10-21 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3576 (Replaces) 2015-10-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3815
H3890 (Replaced by) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2016
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3890 (Replaced by) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2016
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3815 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3815.pdf |