MA H3808 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5075
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reinstatement fees for driver’s licenses. Transportation.
Title
Relative to driver’s license reinstatement fees
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5075 |
2022-01-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H5075 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2346 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3517 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2307 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2378 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H3416 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2346 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3517 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2307 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2378 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H3416 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3808 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3808.pdf |