MA H3517 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Kilcoyne of Northborough, a petition of Meghan Kilcoyne, Vanna Howard and Daniel J. Ryan that the Registrar of Motor Vehicles be directed to collect contact information of license applicants for use in case of emergencies. Transportation.
Title
Relative to Massachusetts drivers license information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-07-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3517 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3517.pdf |