MA H3806 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3797
Note: Replaces legislation S202
Note: Replaces legislation S202
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-28 - House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-28 - House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating secondary metals dealings
Title
Regulating secondary metals dealings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-28 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-12-28 | House | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2016-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #283 [YEAS 34 - NAYS 0] |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read third |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2235 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read second |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Accompanied by S202 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 28, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2235 |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-10-14 | House | Passed to be engrossed 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 163) |
2015-10-14 | House | Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-10-14 | House | Read third |
2015-10-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-14 | House | New draft of H3797 |
2015-10-13 | House | Pending new draft of H3797 |
2015-10-13 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3797 (Replaces) 2015-10-14 - New draft substituted, see H3806
S202 (Replaces) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied H3806
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
S202 (Replaces) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied H3806
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3806 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3806.pdf |