MA H3736 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Truro be authorized to impose a 0.5% real estate transfer fee in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Truro to impose a 0.5% real estate transfer fee
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3804 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3845 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4063 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
S2466 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3845 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4063 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
S2466 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3736 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3736.pdf |