MA H3728 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5190
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electronic weapons and devices. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the transparency of electronic weapons and devices
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] | Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] | Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] |
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5190 |
2021-11-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3484 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3529 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2372 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - New draft substituted, see S2797
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S188 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2568
S435 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S1381 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied H2266
S201 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H5190 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
H3529 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2372 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - New draft substituted, see S2797
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S188 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2568
S435 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S1381 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied H2266
S201 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H5190 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3728 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3728.pdf |