MA S2316 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2964
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the registration and insurance of motorized scooters in the Commonwealth. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the registration and insurance of motorized scooters in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2964 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3484 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H3529 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2372 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - New draft substituted, see S2797
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S188 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2568
S435 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S1381 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied H2266
S201 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2964 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H949 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S595 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H949
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H3529 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2372 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - New draft substituted, see S2797
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S188 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2568
S435 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S1381 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied H2266
S201 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2964 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H949 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S595 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H949
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2316 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2316.pdf |