MA H3717 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 255 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 255 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Benson of Lunenburg and Senator Eldridge, a joint petition of Jennifer E. Benson and James B. Eldridge (by vote of the town) that the town of Harvard be designated as a Commonwealth Economic Target and Opportunity Area. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to adding the town of Harvard to the Devens Economic Target Area
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 255 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-08-16 | House | Enacted |
2012-08-13 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-08-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-07-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-09-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3717 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17350&generalCourtId=1 |