MA H3667 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Hearing: Nov 30 @ 1:00 pm in Virtual Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require funeral directors to make available to potential clients information regarding funeral and burial benefits for veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to burial expenses for veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24JointHearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H3674 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2455 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - House concurred
S2408 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1672 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback