MA H3615 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4863

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to policy and procedures for missing and abducted children. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Massachusetts policy and procedures for missing and abducted children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-31HouseAmendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
2018-07-31HouseRead third
2018-07-31HouseNew draft substituted, see H4863
2018-07-31HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2018-07-31HouseRules suspended
2018-07-31HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2018-07-31HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2018-07-31HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4863
2017-07-20HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2017-05-09JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2643
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1217 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H109 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H926 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3944 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4863 (Replaced by) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback