MA H3563 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3355
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Sannicandro of Ashland, a petition of [PETITIONERS LIST] [BACKING TEXT]. House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets.
Title
Relative to the establishment of a scientific and technology research and development matching grant fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-12-01 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means with the amendment pending |
2011-12-01 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H3801 |
2011-07-01 | House | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2011 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-06-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2011-06-30 | House | New draft of H3355 |
2011-06-30 | House | Reported from the committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3355 (Replaces) 2011-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3563