MA H3524 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Timilty of Milton, a petition of Walter F. Timilty and Sean Garballey for the issuance of an annual proclamation by the Governor designating the month or March as Fibromuscular Dysplasia awareness month. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating March as Fibromuscular Dysplasia Awareness Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H500 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2073 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2074 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2073 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2074 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3524 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3524.pdf |