MA H3503 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4639

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to baseline concussion testing for student athletes. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to baseline concussion testing for student athletes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-16HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4639
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1842 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H1984 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H1876 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H2013 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H549 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4639 (Replaced by) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback