MA H1984 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish an interscholastic athletic head injury safety training program within the Department of Public Health. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to youth concussions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1842 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H1876 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H3503 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H1905 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback