MA H1842 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to directing the Department of Public Health to study the feasibility of reevaluating the process of testing for concussions and similar traumatic brain injuries. Public Health.
Title
Directing the Massachusetts Department of Public Health to study the feasibility of reevaluating the process of testing for concussions and similar traumatic brain injuries
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4639 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1984 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H1876 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H968 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3503 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
S546 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4639 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1876 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H968 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3503 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
S546 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4639 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1842 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1842.pdf |