MA H1876 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4639

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Ms. Farley-Bouvier of Pittsfield, a petition of Tricia Farley-Bouvier and others for an investigation by a special commission to study concussions that occur as a result of varsity sports in public and private high schools. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a commission to study concussions that occur as a result of varsity sports in public and private high schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-16HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4639
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1842 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H1984 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H3503 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4639
H408 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4639 (Replaced by) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback