MA H3415 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the Secretary of the Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs to formulate a plan to increase small business participation in energy savings services and programs. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to increased access of small business to participation in energy savings services and programs
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2141 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1720 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H147 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H3019 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1980 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1720 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H147 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H3019 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1980 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3415 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3415.pdf |