MA H3414 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2493
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote safety for victims of violent crime and human trafficking. The Judiciary.
Title
To promote safety for victims of violent crime and human trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2493 |
2019-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2148 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4437
S168 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S992 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S993 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S995 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
S2493 (Replaced by) 2020-12-10 - New draft substituted, see S2973
S168 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S992 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S993 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S995 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
S2493 (Replaced by) 2020-12-10 - New draft substituted, see S2973
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3414 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3414.pdf |