MA H3414 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the maintenance and upkeep of the Freetown-Fall River State Forest. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to land improvements in the town of Freetown
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Westport Grange |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3252 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H3214 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3238 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3821
H2505 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3487 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3214 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3238 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3821
H2505 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3487 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3414 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3414.pdf |