MA H3214 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ensuring clarity and truthfulness in direct mailings of travel check vouchers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to clarity and truthfulness in direct mailings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-04-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-04-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-01-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3252 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H3238 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3821
H2505 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3487 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3414 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3238 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3821
H2505 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3487 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3414 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3214 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3214.pdf |