MA H3365 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the regional public safety communications and dispatch center for the city of Revere and the town of Winthrop. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Further regulating the regional public safety communications and dispatch center for the city of Revere and the town of Winthrop
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-02-08 | House | Enacted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-12-17 | House | Read second, ordered to the third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-12-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-12-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-12-17 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-07-23 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2015 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H56 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H2016
H3206 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2015
H3551 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Opinions returned, see H3593
H4627 (Similar To) 2016-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Resolves of 2016
H4724 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 427 of the Acts of 2016
H3206 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2015
H3551 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Opinions returned, see H3593
H4627 (Similar To) 2016-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Resolves of 2016
H4724 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 427 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3365 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3365.pdf |