MA H3352 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electric ratepayer protections. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to electric ratepayer protections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2150 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S671 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S651 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S644 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1578 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2969
H4974 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3136 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S416 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S671 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S651 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S644 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1578 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2969
H4974 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3136 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S416 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3352 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3352.pdf |