MA H3308 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring gas or electric companies to notify residential customers prior to discontinuing gas or electric service. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Requiring gas or electric companies to notify residential customers prior to discontinuing gas or electric service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2137 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3308.pdf |