MA S2137 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect broadband access in the Commonwealth. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting broadband access in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-09JointHearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S57 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S671 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S45 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1830 (Similar To) 2021-07-27 - Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2143 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S419 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback