MA H3298 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to parental rights and child survivors of homicide. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to parental rights and child survivors of homicide
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Golden [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Rep. James Arciero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1508 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S924 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S924 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3298 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3298.pdf |