MA H3247 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4311
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the position of poet laureate of the Commonwealth. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Relative to the position of poet laureate for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4311 |
2023-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4311 (Replaced by) 2024-03-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3247 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3247.pdf |