MA H3196 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to energy generation services for individual residential retail customers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to electric ratepayer protections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2106 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2738
S2738 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2738 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3196 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3196.pdf |