MA H3191 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Lewis of Framingham and Fluker Oakley of Boston, a petition of Jack Patrick Lewis, Brandy Fluker Oakley and others for the issuance of an annual proclamation by the Governor to designate the second Monday in October as indigenous people's day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing an Indigenous Peoples Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2027 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2469 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2608
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H3139 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4569
H3189 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S7 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S8 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S2 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Placed on file
S2469 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2608
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H3139 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4569
H3189 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S7 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S8 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S2 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3191 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3191.pdf |