MA H3095 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote diversity on public boards and commissions. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To promote diversity on public boards and commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S286 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2709
S340 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2709
H391 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S2016 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2684 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S340 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2709
H391 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S2016 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2684 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3095 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3095.pdf |