MA H391 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4680

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4680
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to enhancing diversity in the awarding of liquor licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enhance diversity in the awarding of liquor licenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4680
2024-02-01JointHearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2023-05-10JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S162 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S286 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2709
S2684 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4680 (Replaced by) 2024-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback