MA H3082 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to income tax rates. Revenue.
Title
Relative to income tax rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3001 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H2932 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2162 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H1152 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5235
H2013 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S2172 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1075 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S401 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H2932 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2162 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H1152 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5235
H2013 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S2172 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1075 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S401 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3082 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3082.pdf |