MA H3035 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5352
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to tax basis rules for property acquired from decedents. Revenue.
Title
To continue tax basis rules for property acquired from decedents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5352 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
H4060 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H915 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4250
H1508 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1857 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S724 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S193 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2569
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4250 (Similar To) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2022
S2988 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5352 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4060 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H915 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4250
H1508 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1857 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S724 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S193 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2569
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4250 (Similar To) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2022
S2988 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5352 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3035 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3035.pdf |